06/15/2028 |
Joined the Weathertop College Breakouts. |
01/01/2029 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 12 (57); Power: 14 (61); Eye: 16 (49). |
01/01/2030 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 15 (57); Power: 17 (61); Eye: 18 (49). |
06/15/2030 |
Released by the Weathertop College Breakouts. |
06/15/2030 |
Drafted in the 2030 first-year player draft (Round 11, Pick 22, 262nd overall pick) by the Dead Marshes Uruk-hai. |
01/01/2031 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (57); Power: 20 (61); Eye: 26 (49). |
05/31/2031 |
Was selected to the 2031 SGCBL Single A All-Star Game. |
07/24/2031 |
Injured (knee tendinitis), day-to-day for one week. |
01/01/2032 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 37 (57); Power: 22 (61); Eye: 29 (49). |
01/01/2033 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (40); Power: 24 (47); Eye: 27 (37). |
01/01/2034 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (40); Power: 39 (50); Eye: 36 (39). |
06/04/2034 |
Was selected to the 2034 SGCBL Triple A All-Star Game. |
07/10/2034 |
Injured (concussion), day-to-day for 3 days. |
01/01/2035 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 42 (42); Power: 47 (50); Eye: 39 (41). |
11/22/2035 |
Finished 3rd in 2035 SGCBL MC Frodo Rookie Award voting. |
12/09/2035 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2036 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 43 (43); Power: 48 (51); Eye: 39 (41). |
12/12/2036 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2037 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 43 (43); Power: 48 (51); Eye: 40 (43). |
12/06/2037 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $770,000 through arbitration. |
01/01/2038 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 48 (48); Power: 53 (55); Eye: 43 (46). |
11/23/2038 |
Signed a 1-year contract extension worth a total of $990,000 with the Dead Marshes Uruk-hai organization. |
01/01/2039 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 51 (51); Power: 50 (53); Eye: 41 (46). |
07/10/2039 |
Was selected to the 2039 Tolkien Baseball All-Star Game. |
11/18/2039 |
Signed a 1-year contract extension worth a total of $9,800,000 with the Dead Marshes Uruk-hai organization. |
01/01/2040 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 41 (47); Power: 51 (53); Eye: 41 (50). |
03/07/2040 |
Was traded by the Dead Marshes Uruk-hai to the Minas Tirith Titans, along with C Legolas Weissmuller, in exchange for LF Gusil Zayas. |
12/05/2040 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2041 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 41 (44); Power: 51 (53); Eye: 42 (52). |
02/28/2041 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Mirkwood Sylvan organization. |
05/01/2041 |
Was granted free agency by the Mirkwood organization. |
05/09/2041 |
Signed a minor league contract ($350,000 bonus) with the Misty Mountain Hops organization. |
12/10/2041 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2042 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 43 (43); Power: 52 (52); Eye: 44 (44). |
02/09/2042 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Old Forest Merry Fellows organization. |
12/12/2042 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/2043 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 39 (39); Power: 51 (51); Eye: 44 (44). |
04/15/2043 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Grey Havens Stars organization. |
12/13/2043 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/2044 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 32 (32); Power: 47 (47); Eye: 46 (46). |
11/18/2044 |
Retired from professional baseball. |