06/15/2031 |
Joined the Rushey College Roughnecks. |
01/01/2032 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 19 (43); Power: 12 (51); Eye: 19 (55). |
01/01/2033 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 3 (24); Power: 13 (40); Eye: 9 (43). |
04/24/2033 |
Was selected to the 2033 SGCBL College I All-Star Game. |
06/15/2033 |
Released by the Rushey College Roughnecks. |
06/15/2033 |
Drafted in the 2033 first-year player draft (Round 4, Pick 7, 79th overall pick) by the Lake Town Archers. |
08/15/2033 |
Released by the Lake Town organization. |
01/01/2034 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 10 (25); Power: 17 (42); Eye: 21 (45). |
02/28/2034 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Minas Morgul Slayers organization. |
05/31/2034 |
Was selected to the 2034 SGCBL Single A All-Star Game. |
01/01/2035 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 16 (26); Power: 25 (42); Eye: 33 (47). |
01/01/2036 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 20 (26); Power: 32 (43); Eye: 48 (48). |
04/12/2036 |
Injured (Knee inflammation), day-to-day for 2 weeks. |
01/01/2037 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 22 (25); Power: 36 (43); Eye: 51 (51). |
01/01/2038 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 32 (32); Power: 43 (48); Eye: 47 (47). |
01/01/2039 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 49 (49); Eye: 44 (44). |
12/07/2039 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/2040 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 36 (36); Power: 50 (50); Eye: 44 (44). |
03/02/2040 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Dagorlad Disaster organization. |
06/30/2040 |
Injured (Fractured hand), out for 4-5 weeks. |
12/05/2040 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2041 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 33 (33); Power: 49 (49); Eye: 41 (41). |
12/10/2041 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2042 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (32); Power: 48 (48); Eye: 39 (47). |
04/28/2042 |
Wins the A FL Player of the Week Award. |
05/31/2042 |
Was selected to the 2042 SGCBL Single A All-Star Game. |
12/12/2042 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2043 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (32); Power: 48 (48); Eye: 40 (48). |
09/18/2043 |
Wins the 2043 SGCBL Triple A Triple A Championships with the Harad Wainriders! |
12/13/2043 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2044 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (34); Power: 49 (49); Eye: 45 (45). |
01/01/2045 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 33 (33); Power: 49 (49); Eye: 45 (45). |
11/20/2045 |
Drafted in the 2045 inaugural draft by the Isengard Night Hawks. (Round 14, Pick 6, 136th overall pick). |
01/01/2046 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (30); Power: 45 (45); Eye: 45 (45). |
03/20/2046 |
Injured (bruised shin),day-to-day for 5 days. |
06/21/2046 |
Released by the Imlad Morgul Night Hawks. |
11/12/2046 |
Retired from professional baseball. |