06/15/2031 |
Joined the Bree College Emperors. |
01/01/2032 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 13 (41); Power: 12 (41); Eye: 16 (45). |
01/01/2033 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 1 (23); Power: 16 (32); Eye: 5 (33). |
06/15/2033 |
Released by the Bree College Emperors. |
06/15/2033 |
Drafted in the 2033 first-year player draft (Round 7, Pick 6, 150th overall pick) by the Dagorlad Disaster. |
01/01/2034 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 8 (23); Power: 22 (35); Eye: 17 (35). |
01/03/2034 |
Injured (mild abdominal strain), day-to-day for 6 days. |
04/23/2034 |
Injured (broken kneecap), out for 5-6 months. |
01/01/2035 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 14 (24); Power: 25 (35); Eye: 20 (37). |
01/01/2036 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 18 (24); Power: 34 (36); Eye: 28 (37). |
06/27/2036 |
Injured (Strained groin), out for 6 weeks. |
07/26/2036 |
Suffered setback in recovery from injury, will miss another 3 weeks. |
01/01/2037 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 22 (24); Power: 36 (36); Eye: 34 (39). |
01/01/2038 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 33 (33); Power: 41 (41); Eye: 41 (42). |
03/02/2038 |
Injured (Food poisoning), out for 2 days. |
06/30/2038 |
Goes 5-5 against the Mittalmar Herders, with 2 2B, 3 RBI and 0 R. |
01/01/2039 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 32 (32); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 44 (44). |
05/05/2039 |
Injured (Cold), day-to-day for 1 day. |
12/07/2039 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2040 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (31); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 41 (43). |
12/05/2040 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2041 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 33 (33); Power: 41 (41); Eye: 45 (45). |
12/10/2041 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2042 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 36 (36); Power: 41 (41); Eye: 45 (45). |
04/08/2042 |
Was claimed off waivers by Land of Oz while with Dagorlad. |
12/12/2042 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2043 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 36 (36); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 44 (47). |
12/12/2043 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $502,000. |
01/01/2044 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 36 (36); Power: 41 (41); Eye: 51 (51). |
01/18/2044 |
Was traded by the Land of Oz Munchkins to the Old Forest Merry Fellows in exchange for LF Teshome Timlussson, 3B Meneaduc Whitfoot. |
12/12/2044 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2045 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 33 (33); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 51 (51). |
11/20/2045 |
Drafted in the 2045 inaugural draft by the Tirion Navigators. (Round 6, Pick 7, 57th overall pick). |
01/01/2046 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 33 (33); Power: 36 (36); Eye: 51 (51). |
06/20/2046 |
Released by the Tirion Navigators. |
09/30/2046 |
Wins the 2046 Middle Earth League Championship with the Tirion Navigators. |
01/01/2047 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 33 (33); Power: 38 (38); Eye: 55 (55). |
11/11/2047 |
Retired from professional baseball. |