06/15/2030 |
Drafted in the 2030 first-year player draft (Round 3, Pick 14, 50th overall pick) by the Star Fleet Academy Cadets. |
11/28/2030 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $400,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2031 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 47 (55); Power: 33 (46); Eye: 21 (35). |
12/01/2031 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $400,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2032 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 49 (54); Power: 41 (46); Eye: 23 (23). |
09/17/2032 |
Wins the 2032 Championship with the Star Fleet Academy Cadets. |
12/01/2032 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $400,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2033 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (36); Power: 34 (35); Eye: 10 (10). |
12/09/2033 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $400,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2034 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 32 (36); Power: 37 (38); Eye: 12 (12). |
01/01/2035 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (37); Power: 37 (38); Eye: 16 (16). |
05/27/2035 |
Was selected to the 2035 SFL Triple A All-Star Game. |
06/30/2035 |
Injured (hamstring strain), out for 3 weeks. |
12/09/2035 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $400,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2036 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (37); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 17 (17). |
05/02/2036 |
Was claimed off waivers by Rivendell while with Star Fleet Academy. |
06/21/2036 |
Was claimed off waivers by Intergalactic while with Rivendell. |
12/12/2036 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
12/30/2036 |
Was traded by the Intergalactic Hitchhikers to the Serenity Valley Fireflies, along with CF Jean-René Batal, in exchange for SP Coka Myapoka. |
01/01/2037 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 36 (36); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 18 (18). |
12/08/2037 |
Became a free agent. |
12/29/2037 |
Signed a 1-year contract worth a total of $570,000 with the Serenity Valley Fireflies organization. |
01/01/2038 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 46 (46); Power: 45 (45); Eye: 16 (19). |
04/16/2038 |
Was claimed off waivers by Moria while with Serenity Valley. |
05/07/2038 |
Was claimed off waivers by Earthsea while with Moria. |
12/12/2038 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2039 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 42 (42); Power: 42 (42); Eye: 15 (22). |
11/14/2039 |
Retired from professional baseball. |