05/18/2010 |
Drafted in 1st round, 16th overall pick, by Dagorlad in 2010. |
07/13/2010 |
Had first career hit on 7/13/2010, off Fisil Goldworthy (BYW). |
05/30/2012 |
Hit first career homerun on 5/30/2012, off Galealbo Elvwen (MIN). |
12/01/2012 |
Won Return of the King Series with Dagorlad in 2012. |
11/17/2013 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $358,800 through arbitration. |
01/01/2014 |
SISA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 63 (57); Power: 17 (10); Eye: 63 (72). |
09/02/2014 |
Injured (strained rib cage muscle), out for 2 weeks. |
11/18/2014 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $300,000 through arbitration. |
01/01/2015 |
SISA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 55 (56); Power: 12 (10); Eye: 66 (72). |
07/26/2015 |
Injured (sprained ankle), day-to-day for one week. |
11/21/2015 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $300,000 through arbitration. |
01/01/2016 |
SISA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 53 (54); Power: 12 (10); Eye: 66 (75). |
11/20/2016 |
Became a free agent. |
12/21/2016 |
Signed a 2-year contract worth a total of $1,560,000 with the Erebor Eagles organization. |
01/01/2017 |
SISA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 53 (54); Power: 12 (10); Eye: 66 (77). |
10/31/2017 |
Was traded by the Erebor Eagles to the Minas Morgul Slayers, along with 2B D. Elylith, CL H. Gandillas, in exchange for 2B M. Grudgesmelter, a 2nd draft pick. |
01/01/2018 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 53 (53); Power: 11 (10); Eye: 66 (78). |
04/01/2018 |
Released by the Minas Morgul Slayers. |
05/16/2018 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Grey Havens Stars organization. |
07/11/2018 |
Released by the Grey Havens Stars. |
01/01/2019 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 52 (53); Power: 9 (10); Eye: 66 (76). |
01/01/2020 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 51 (52); Power: 9 (10); Eye: 67 (71). |
01/01/2020 |
Retired from professional baseball. |