01/02/2024 |
Drafted in the 2024 inaugural draft (Round 48, Pick 5, 757th overall pick) by the Star Fleet Academy Cadets. |
04/15/2024 |
Named the #91 prospect in the SFL |
10/28/2024 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $400,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2025 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 42 (50); Power: 16 (25); Eye: 36 (49). |
04/21/2025 |
Named the #23 prospect in the SFL |
11/01/2025 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $400,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2026 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 46 (51); Power: 17 (25); Eye: 40 (53). |
11/27/2026 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $400,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2027 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 50 (53); Power: 22 (33); Eye: 50 (50). |
03/26/2027 |
Injured on 03/23/2027, diagnosed with a forearm strain, will miss one week. |
11/28/2027 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $650,000 through arbitration. |
01/01/2028 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 51 (53); Power: 24 (33); Eye: 41 (41). |
07/26/2028 |
Was traded by the Star Fleet Academy Cadets to the Earthsea Dragons in exchange for LF Rak Ogreslobberer. |
10/24/2028 |
Injured (Brandywine River fever), day-to-day for 4 days. |
11/21/2028 |
Was not offered arbitration and became a free agent. |
01/01/2029 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 52 (53); Power: 28 (33); Eye: 36 (36). |
04/16/2029 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Gallifrey Time Lords organization. |
08/09/2029 |
Signed a 1-year contract extension worth a total of $650,000 with the Gallifrey Time Lords organization. |
12/20/2029 |
Was traded by the Gallifrey Time Lords to the Forgotten Realms Kobolds, along with CL Grumpus Chain Sl, in exchange for LF Hudash Ratbelly. |
01/01/2030 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 52 (52); Power: 29 (32); Eye: 35 (35). |
07/19/2030 |
Injured (hip flexor strain), out for one week. |
11/28/2030 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2031 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 53 (53); Power: 29 (32); Eye: 34 (34). |
04/16/2031 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Diagon Alley Wizards organization. |
01/01/2032 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 54 (54); Power: 29 (32); Eye: 38 (38). |
06/19/2032 |
Released by the Diagon Alley Wizards. |
06/19/2032 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Dyson Spheres organization. |
06/19/2032 |
Released by the Dyson Spheres. |
07/01/2032 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Serenity Valley Fireflies organization. |
01/01/2033 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (32); Power: 23 (25); Eye: 25 (25). |
01/01/2034 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 29 (31); Power: 27 (27); Eye: 30 (30). |
01/01/2035 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 29 (30); Power: 25 (27); Eye: 32 (32). |
04/20/2035 |
Released by the Serenity Valley organization. |
05/22/2035 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Babylon Five Rangers organization. |
05/22/2035 |
Released by the Babylon Five Rangers. |
06/14/2035 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Serenity Valley Fireflies organization. |
06/15/2035 |
Released by the Serenity Valley organization. |
01/01/2036 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 29 (29); Power: 26 (28); Eye: 32 (32). |
01/01/2036 |
Retired from professional baseball. |