06/25/2025 |
Joined the Armenelos College Imperials. |
01/01/2026 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 1 (40); Power: 2 (34); Eye: 5 (26). |
01/01/2027 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 9 (40); Power: 7 (34); Eye: 7 (26). |
01/01/2028 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 19 (40); Power: 13 (34); Eye: 12 (26). |
01/01/2029 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (41); Power: 18 (34); Eye: 16 (26). |
06/15/2029 |
Went undrafted and became a free agent. |
09/01/2029 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Ettenmoors Eruption organization. |
01/01/2030 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (41); Power: 21 (34); Eye: 21 (26). |
01/01/2031 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 37 (41); Power: 26 (34); Eye: 29 (29). |
01/01/2032 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 40 (41); Power: 31 (34); Eye: 29 (29). |
01/01/2033 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 26 (26); Power: 30 (30); Eye: 25 (25). |
04/17/2033 |
Injured (mild hamstring strain), day-to-day for 5 days. |
01/01/2034 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 38 (38); Power: 49 (49); Eye: 46 (46). |
12/06/2034 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2035 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 37 (42); Power: 53 (54); Eye: 42 (50). |
11/04/2035 |
Wins the 2035 Return of the King Series with the Dol Guldur Dragons. |
11/14/2035 |
Won the 2035 Ultimate Fantasy Baseball Association Ultimate Championship with the Dol Guldur Dragons! |
12/09/2035 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2036 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (41); Power: 52 (54); Eye: 42 (53). |
04/28/2036 |
Was claimed off waivers by Weathertop while with Dol Guldur. |
12/12/2036 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2037 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 32 (33); Power: 54 (54); Eye: 45 (54). |
04/08/2037 |
Was claimed off waivers by Dagorlad while with Weathertop. |
07/15/2037 |
Was claimed off waivers by Mos Eisley while with Dagorlad. |
11/18/2037 |
Was traded by the Mos Eisley Wookies to the Serenity Valley Fireflies, along with CF Mees Souto, CF Lalia Hill, in exchange for RF Grak Kidneycrusher. |
12/08/2037 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2038 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 38 (38); Power: 60 (60); Eye: 49 (60). |
12/12/2038 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2039 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 37 (38); Power: 56 (59); Eye: 52 (62). |
04/17/2039 |
Was claimed off waivers by Chiba City while with Serenity Valley. |
12/07/2039 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2040 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (38); Power: 56 (59); Eye: 54 (63). |
04/29/2040 |
Was claimed off waivers by Grey Havens while with Chiba City. |
06/30/2040 |
Injured (Hand contusion), out for 6 days. |
09/13/2040 |
Injured (Flu-like symptoms), day-to-day for 6 days. |
12/05/2040 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2041 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 37 (37); Power: 56 (58); Eye: 56 (64). |
07/07/2041 |
Was selected to the 2041 Tolkien Baseball All-Star Game. |
12/08/2041 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $840,000 through arbitration. |
01/01/2042 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 33 (33); Power: 54 (54); Eye: 56 (56). |
06/03/2042 |
Was claimed off waivers by Erebor while with Grey Havens. |
11/19/2042 |
Retired from professional baseball. |