06/15/2037 |
Drafted in the 2037 first-year player draft (Round 2, Pick 1, 19th overall pick) by the Mos Eisley Wookies. |
01/01/2038 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 38 (62); Movement: 35 (49); Control: 15 (53). |
01/01/2039 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 42 (50); Movement: 38 (46); Control: 19 (32). |
07/14/2039 |
Released by the Mos Eisley organization. |
08/06/2039 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Star Fleet Academy Cadets organization. |
01/01/2040 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 42 (49); Movement: 35 (40); Control: 22 (31). |
01/01/2041 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 44 (46); Movement: 35 (41); Control: 29 (31). |
07/31/2041 |
Was traded by the Star Fleet Academy Cadets to the Land of Oz Munchkins in exchange for RP Fesur Fairfield, CF Skorbog Giantthrottler. |
08/07/2041 |
Wins the 2041 SFL Triple A Round 2 with the Vulcan Volcanoes! |
12/10/2041 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $400,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2042 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 46 (46); Movement: 36 (41); Control: 28 (31). |
04/11/2042 |
Released by the Land of Oz organization. |
06/10/2042 |
Signed a minor league contract ($37,000 bonus) with the Babylon Five Rangers organization. |
01/01/2043 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 44 (45); Movement: 42 (46); Control: 30 (30). |
04/10/2043 |
Released by the Babylon Five organization. |
04/22/2043 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Intergalactic Hitchhikers organization. |
08/24/2043 |
Released by the Intergalactic organization. |
08/24/2043 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Forgotten Realms Kobolds organization. |
09/23/2043 |
Injured (stomach virus),day-to-day for 3 days. |
12/12/2043 |
Signed a minor league contract extension with the Forgotten Realms Kobolds organization. |
01/01/2044 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 42 (44); Movement: 39 (40); Control: 35 (35). |
04/08/2044 |
Released by the Forgotten Realms organization. |
04/11/2044 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Intergalactic Hitchhikers organization. |
08/06/2044 |
Injured (sinus infection),day-to-day for 3 days. |
08/30/2044 |
Released by the Intergalactic organization. |
11/18/2044 |
Retired from professional baseball. |