06/15/2039 |
Drafted in the 2039 first-year player draft by the Serenity Valley Fireflies (Round 8, Pick 1, 127th overall pick). |
01/01/2040 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 37 (60); Movement: 17 (22); Control: 15 (36). |
01/01/2041 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 41 (55); Movement: 21 (21); Control: 30 (36). |
03/10/2041 |
Was traded by the Serenity Valley Fireflies to the Xanth Centaurs, along with 2B Legeon Brilhirion, in exchange for C Roignar Heartmasher, SP Brubgush A'arim. |
01/01/2042 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 46 (54); Movement: 16 (16); Control: 31 (35). |
01/01/2043 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 51 (53); Movement: 16 (16); Control: 37 (37). |
04/10/2043 |
Released by the Xanth organization. |
04/13/2043 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Earthsea Dragons organization. |
07/17/2043 |
Released by the Earthsea organization. |
07/20/2043 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Serenity Valley Fireflies organization. |
01/01/2044 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 54 (54); Movement: 16 (16); Control: 39 (39). |
06/16/2044 |
Released by the Serenity Valley organization. |
06/20/2044 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Babylon Five Rangers organization. |
01/01/2045 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 53 (53); Movement: 22 (22); Control: 39 (39). |
04/14/2045 |
Released by the Babylon Five organization. |
04/17/2045 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Dyson Spheres organization. |
12/04/2045 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/2046 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 50 (51); Movement: 21 (21); Control: 36 (36). |
11/12/2046 |
Retired from professional baseball. |