06/15/2035 |
Drafted in the 2035 first-year player draft (Round 3, Pick 15, 51st overall pick) by the Intergalactic Hitchhikers. |
01/01/2036 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (26); Power: 19 (48); Eye: 13 (38). |
07/30/2036 |
Was traded by the Intergalactic Hitchhikers to the Lothlorien Lumberjacks, along with RF Denehir Smuwyn, in exchange for SP Thaitai Galindil. |
09/01/2036 |
Wins the 2036 Single A Championships MVP Award. |
09/02/2036 |
Wins the 2036 SGCBL Single A Single A Championships with the Belfalas Bounty! |
01/01/2037 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 11 (28); Power: 28 (52); Eye: 26 (45). |
05/04/2037 |
Wins the A FL Player of the Week Award. |
05/31/2037 |
Was selected to the 2037 SGCBL Single A All-Star Game. |
01/01/2038 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 22 (32); Power: 32 (49); Eye: 34 (34). |
01/01/2039 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 28 (32); Power: 37 (48); Eye: 35 (35). |
06/18/2039 |
Released by the Lothlorien organization. |
06/28/2039 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Minas Tirith Titans organization. |
01/01/2040 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (31); Power: 47 (48); Eye: 35 (35). |
05/14/2040 |
Injured (Fractured foot), out for 5 weeks. |
07/15/2040 |
Suspended 4 games after ejection following a brawl. |
07/31/2040 |
Injured (Sore back), day-to-day for 1 day. |
01/01/2041 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (34); Power: 48 (48); Eye: 36 (36). |
12/10/2041 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2042 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 48 (48); Eye: 36 (36). |
06/15/2042 |
Released by the Minas Tirith organization. |
08/13/2042 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Grey Havens Stars organization. |
08/17/2042 |
Released by the Grey Havens organization. |
08/27/2042 |
Signed a minor league contract ($70,000 bonus) with the Old Forest Merry Fellows organization. |
09/03/2042 |
Wins the 2042 SGCBL Double A Double A Championships with the Lhun Stars! |
12/12/2042 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $502,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2043 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 48 (48); Eye: 35 (35). |
07/09/2043 |
Injured (back spasms),day-to-day for 1 day. |
12/13/2043 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $502,000. |
01/01/2044 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 33 (33); Power: 48 (48); Eye: 39 (39). |
02/29/2044 |
Was traded by the Old Forest Merry Fellows to the Xanth Centaurs, along with 1B Aharon Cremeans, SP Rugrub Legslobberer, C Feli Trollbane, in exchange for RF Frilma the Cougar. |
12/11/2044 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $502,000. |
01/01/2045 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 29 (30); Power: 45 (49); Eye: 38 (38). |
12/04/2045 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $502,000. |
01/01/2046 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 28 (31); Power: 45 (48); Eye: 40 (40). |
12/05/2046 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $502,000. |
01/01/2047 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (31); Power: 47 (47); Eye: 39 (39). |
09/11/2047 |
Injured (flu),day-to-day for 3 days. |
12/04/2047 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2048 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (31); Power: 48 (48); Eye: 41 (41). |
11/21/2048 |
Retired from professional baseball. |