06/15/2039 |
Drafted in the 2039 first-year player draft by the Earthsea Dragons (Round 7, Pick 6, 114th overall pick). |
01/01/2040 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (44); Power: 25 (37); Eye: 29 (42). |
01/01/2041 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 39 (44); Power: 31 (37); Eye: 32 (42). |
05/19/2041 |
Injured (Sore ankle), day-to-day for 5 days. |
01/01/2042 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 44 (45); Power: 32 (37); Eye: 34 (42). |
01/01/2043 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 49 (49); Power: 33 (34); Eye: 34 (42). |
01/01/2044 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 46 (46); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 35 (43). |
01/01/2045 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 37 (37); Eye: 37 (45). |
12/04/2045 |
Signed a minor league contract extension with the Earthsea Dragons organization. |
01/01/2046 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 38 (46). |
06/07/2046 |
Injured (back stiffness),day-to-day for one week. |
07/16/2046 |
Was traded by the Earthsea Dragons to the Serenity Valley Fireflies, along with SP Fedyenka Goldilocks, in exchange for CF Melampus Grub, RP Mokgor Propwarrior, 2B Mijalko Soberano, and a 3rd round draft pick. |
12/05/2046 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/2047 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 44 (44); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 39 (39). |
11/11/2047 |
Retired from professional baseball. |