06/15/2038 |
Drafted in the 2038 first-year player draft by the Forgotten Realms Kobolds (Round 5, Pick 12, 84th overall pick). |
07/17/2038 |
Was traded by the Forgotten Realms Kobolds to the Mos Eisley Wookies, along with 1B Duunk Giantthrottler, in exchange for 3B Josh Proudneck, 1B Kashnak Lapi. |
01/01/2039 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 11 (34); Power: 11 (51); Eye: 24 (37). |
01/01/2040 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 22 (34); Power: 11 (51); Eye: 32 (35). |
01/01/2041 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 26 (34); Power: 18 (51); Eye: 38 (38). |
01/01/2042 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (35); Power: 30 (51); Eye: 40 (40). |
01/01/2043 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (35); Power: 33 (51); Eye: 40 (40). |
12/12/2043 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $400,000. |
01/01/2044 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 37 (37); Power: 41 (52); Eye: 40 (40). |
12/11/2044 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $400,000. |
01/01/2045 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 37 (37); Power: 48 (52); Eye: 41 (41). |
12/04/2045 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $400,000. |
01/01/2046 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 36 (36); Power: 52 (52); Eye: 37 (37). |
08/07/2046 |
Wins the 2046 SFL Triple A Round 2 with the Iron Mountains Gold Rush! |
09/20/2046 |
Wins the 2046 Championship with the Karak Kadrin Slayers. |
11/11/2046 |
Won the 2046 Ultimate Fantasy Baseball Association Ultimate Championship with the Karak Kadrin Slayers! |
12/05/2046 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $400,000. |
01/01/2047 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 51 (53); Eye: 33 (37). |
12/04/2047 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2048 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 37 (37); Power: 48 (51); Eye: 38 (42). |
11/21/2048 |
Retired from professional baseball. |