06/15/2039 |
Drafted in the 2039 first-year player draft by the Forgotten Realms Kobolds (Round 17, Pick 5, 293rd overall pick). |
07/25/2039 |
Injured (Food poisoning), out for 1 day. |
01/01/2040 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 20 (27); Power: 28 (45); Eye: 40 (49). |
06/27/2040 |
Was traded by the Forgotten Realms Kobolds to the Ravenhill Darkwings, along with SS Lelyan Elothien, in exchange for SP Bill Sandyman. |
01/01/2041 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 24 (27); Power: 40 (45); Eye: 40 (49). |
01/01/2042 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (30); Power: 45 (45); Eye: 48 (49). |
05/08/2042 |
Injured (Fractured rib), out for 3 weeks. |
05/28/2042 |
Suffered setback in recovery from injury, requires surgery and will miss another 6-7 weeks. |
01/01/2043 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (30); Power: 46 (46); Eye: 54 (54). |
06/11/2043 |
Injured (herniated disc (back)),out for 1-2 weeks. |
01/01/2044 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 28 (28); Power: 47 (47); Eye: 54 (54). |
12/12/2044 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $502,000. |
01/01/2045 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 26 (27); Power: 46 (46); Eye: 52 (55). |
05/20/2045 |
Injured (calf strain),out for 3-4 weeks. |
12/05/2045 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $502,000. |
01/01/2046 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 28 (28); Power: 45 (45); Eye: 49 (49). |
12/06/2046 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2047 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 27 (27); Power: 46 (46); Eye: 50 (50). |
08/05/2047 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Dagorlad Disaster organization. |
11/11/2047 |
Released by the Dagorlad organization. |
11/11/2047 |
Retired from professional baseball. |