02/20/2043 |
Joined the Haven of Umbar College A's. |
01/01/2044 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 2 (30); Power: 19 (56); Eye: 10 (36). |
05/15/2044 |
Injured (sprained wrist),day-to-day for 3 weeks. |
06/15/2044 |
Released by the Haven of Umbar College A's. |
06/15/2044 |
Drafted in the 2044 first-year player draft by the Ravenhill Darkwings. (Round 17, Pick 8, 392nd overall pick). |
01/01/2045 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 7 (29); Power: 23 (56); Eye: 13 (37). |
06/27/2045 |
Released by the Ravenhill organization. |
11/20/2045 |
Drafted in the 2045 inaugural draft by the Rhun Wheat Kings. (Round 24, Pick 3, 233rd overall pick). |
01/01/2046 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 12 (30); Power: 28 (55); Eye: 18 (36). |
03/30/2046 |
Released by the Rhun Wheat Kings. |
04/05/2046 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Romenna Lakers organization. |
04/08/2046 |
Named the #63 prospect in the MEIL |
06/26/2046 |
Released by the Romenna Lakers. |
11/03/2046 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Imlad Morgul Night Hawks organization. |
01/01/2047 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 13 (26); Power: 29 (52); Eye: 20 (36). |
07/09/2047 |
Was traded by the Imlad Morgul Night Hawks to the Numenor Kings in exchange for RP Iaim the Devastator. |
01/01/2048 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 23 (28); Power: 31 (51); Eye: 25 (37). |
03/02/2048 |
Released by the Numenor organization. |
11/21/2048 |
Retired from professional baseball. |