04/11/2010 |
Signed as a free agent by Wilderland on 4/11/2010 to a minor league deal. |
01/01/2014 |
SISA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 37 (53); Movement: 61 (65); Control: 39 (43). |
01/01/2015 |
SISA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 43 (53); Movement: 68 (65); Control: 41 (43). |
07/13/2015 |
Was traded by the Wilderland Wargs to the Ravenhill Darkwings, along with 3B M. Marblerage, SP T. Treegirl, in exchange for C H. Hammermaker, 3B P. Hearteater, 2B B. Sandybanks, CL G. Foeslayer, MR N. Silverbinder. |
01/01/2016 |
SISA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 54 (53); Movement: 68 (65); Control: 45 (43). |
03/05/2016 |
Got claimed off waivers by Dol Guldur while with Ravenhill. |
07/15/2016 |
Injured (strained back muscle), out for 1-2 weeks. |
11/20/2016 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $300,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2017 |
SISA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 55 (53); Movement: 67 (65); Control: 46 (43). |
06/26/2017 |
Injured (torn bicep muscle), out for 7 months. |
01/01/2018 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 51 (51); Movement: 57 (49); Control: 53 (53). |
05/08/2018 |
Released by the Dol Guldur Dragons. |
01/01/2019 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 47 (50); Movement: 51 (49); Control: 53 (53). |
01/01/2020 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 51 (49); Movement: 52 (49); Control: 54 (54). |
01/01/2020 |
Retired from professional baseball. |