05/18/2005 |
Drafted in 2nd round, 44th overall pick, by Rivendell in 2005. |
04/30/2007 |
Injured on 4/30/2007 with a Blister On Finger, out for 5 days. |
05/12/2009 |
Injured on 5/12/2009 with a Tight Shoulder, out for 6 days. |
06/12/2010 |
Injured on 6/12/2010 with a Bruised Jaw, out for 6 days. |
04/27/2011 |
Earned first career win on 4/27/2011. |
07/11/2012 |
Had first career hit on 7/11/2012, off Vincent Rogers (DG). |
07/30/2013 |
Was traded by the Rivendell Royals to the Moria Miners in exchange for SP D. Deneadur, MR F. Orc-death, $3,000,000. |
07/30/2013 |
Changed name from James Gilbertson to Theodorus Tumbletoe. |
07/31/2013 |
Signed a 7-year contract extension worth a total of $28,000,000 with the Moria Miners organization. |
01/01/2014 |
SISA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 74 (76); Movement: 90 (91); Control: 40 (41). |
01/01/2015 |
SISA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 75 (76); Movement: 89 (91); Control: 41 (41). |
07/01/2015 |
Wins the SGCBL SC Pitcher of the Month Award. |
07/05/2015 |
Injured (pipeweed addiction), day-to-day for 4 days. |
01/01/2016 |
SISA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 74 (76); Movement: 90 (91); Control: 41 (41). |
01/01/2017 |
SISA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 72 (74); Movement: 91 (91); Control: 41 (42). |
01/01/2018 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 70 (73); Movement: 91 (91); Control: 43 (43). |
01/01/2019 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 67 (71); Movement: 89 (91); Control: 44 (43). |
02/26/2019 |
Was traded by the Moria Miners to the Erebor Eagles, along with a 2nd draft pick, in exchange for SP D. Mejias, a 1st draft pick. |
09/02/2019 |
Injured (damaged meniscus (knee)), out for 6 weeks. |
01/01/2020 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 67 (68); Movement: 90 (91); Control: 43 (44). |
04/27/2020 |
Injured (back tightness), day-to-day for 2 days. |
11/23/2020 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2021 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 72 (72); Movement: 71 (71); Control: 45 (45). |
01/11/2021 |
Signed a 3-year contract worth a total of $10,000,000 with the Minas Morgul Slayers organization. |
03/03/2021 |
Injured (torn labrum (Shoulder)), out for 9-10 months. |
10/28/2021 |
Retired from professional baseball. |