06/15/2028 |
Went undrafted and became a free agent. |
01/01/2029 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 28 (37); Power: 17 (43); Eye: 28 (41). |
06/01/2029 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Gallifrey Time Lords organization. |
01/01/2030 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (37); Power: 24 (43); Eye: 28 (41). |
01/01/2031 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (37); Power: 33 (43); Eye: 33 (41). |
01/01/2032 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 33 (37); Power: 36 (43); Eye: 35 (41). |
01/01/2033 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 16 (18); Power: 34 (34); Eye: 31 (31). |
07/25/2033 |
Was traded by the Gallifrey Time Lords to the New New York Blernsballers, along with C David Black, in exchange for SP Diaalia Eidoc, LF Flambard Buckland. |
07/25/2033 |
Released by the New New York organization. |
12/09/2033 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $400,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2034 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 18 (18); Power: 38 (38); Eye: 35 (35). |
12/06/2034 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $400,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2035 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 21 (21); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 35 (35). |
12/09/2035 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $400,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2036 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 20 (20); Power: 39 (39); Eye: 36 (36). |
12/12/2036 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $400,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2037 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 18 (19); Power: 37 (38); Eye: 40 (40). |
07/27/2037 |
Released by the New New York organization. |
11/15/2037 |
Retired from professional baseball. |