06/27/2023 |
Joined the Ethring College Mercenaries. |
01/01/2024 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 1 (73); Power: 2 (58); Eye: 5 (49). |
01/01/2025 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (73); Power: 5 (58); Eye: 5 (49). |
01/01/2026 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 19 (73); Power: 12 (58); Eye: 17 (49). |
01/01/2027 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 26 (73); Power: 18 (58); Eye: 23 (49). |
04/01/2027 |
Injured (strained rib cage muscle), day-to-day for 1-2 weeks. |
04/24/2027 |
Was selected to the 2027 SGCBL College I All-Star Game. |
06/15/2027 |
Released by the Ethring College Mercenaries. |
06/15/2027 |
Drafted in the 2027 first-year player draft (Round 5, Pick 4, 100th overall pick) by the Bywater Bounders. |
01/01/2028 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (73); Power: 35 (58); Eye: 28 (49). |
05/14/2028 |
Goes 6-6 against the Lhun Attics, with 1 2B, 1 RBI and 3 R. |
05/15/2028 |
Wins the AA BL Player of the Week Award. |
09/18/2028 |
Won the 2028 SGCBL Triple A Triple A Championships with the Crickhollow Cads! |
11/24/2028 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $432,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2029 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 50 (72); Power: 35 (57); Eye: 30 (51). |
07/05/2029 |
Goes 5-6 against the Nisimaldor Knights, with 2 2B, 4 RBI and 3 R. |
07/19/2029 |
Goes 5-6 against the Highland Colts, with 4 RBI and 2 R. |
01/01/2030 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 52 (65); Power: 35 (52); Eye: 35 (44). |
12/17/2030 |
Got claimed off waivers by New New York while with Bywater. |
01/01/2031 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 48 (59); Power: 35 (50); Eye: 36 (46). |
12/01/2031 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $400,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2032 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 49 (54); Power: 35 (47); Eye: 36 (48). |
12/01/2032 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $400,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2033 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (32); Power: 28 (31); Eye: 25 (38). |
07/25/2033 |
Was traded by the New New York Blernsballers to the Gallifrey Time Lords, along with SP Diaalia Eidoc, in exchange for 3B Vrugar the Wretched, C David Black. |
01/01/2034 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (32); Power: 28 (31); Eye: 28 (40). |
12/06/2034 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/2035 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (30); Power: 26 (29); Eye: 31 (42). |
04/13/2035 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Archenland Stallions organization. |
12/09/2035 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/2036 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 29 (30); Power: 28 (30); Eye: 31 (44). |
01/01/2037 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 23 (27); Power: 27 (28); Eye: 33 (47). |
11/15/2037 |
Retired from professional baseball. |