06/15/2039 |
Joined the Osgiliath College Devilfish. |
01/01/2040 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 7 (31); Power: 9 (24); Eye: 14 (50). |
04/17/2040 |
Injured (Post-concussion syndrome), out for 10 months. |
01/01/2041 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 11 (31); Power: 14 (25); Eye: 17 (50). |
06/15/2041 |
Released by the Osgiliath College Devilfish. |
06/15/2041 |
Drafted in the 2041 first-year player draft by the Rivendell Royals (Round 12, Pick 23, 287th overall pick). |
01/01/2042 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 18 (32); Power: 15 (24); Eye: 26 (50). |
03/10/2042 |
Was traded by the Rivendell Royals to the Dyson Spheres, along with 1B Merin Belöl, in exchange for RP Ugrog Sildshul. |
11/16/2042 |
Injured (Sinus infection), day-to-day for 2 days. |
01/01/2043 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (33); Power: 16 (23); Eye: 48 (50). |
01/01/2044 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 24 (24); Eye: 54 (54). |
01/01/2045 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 36 (36); Power: 26 (26); Eye: 55 (55). |
08/04/2045 |
Wins the 2045 SFL Triple A Round 2 with the Rimmerworld Clones! |
12/04/2045 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $400,000. |
01/01/2046 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 26 (26); Eye: 52 (52). |
01/01/2047 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (34); Power: 27 (27); Eye: 46 (52). |
12/04/2047 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2048 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 37 (37); Power: 25 (26); Eye: 48 (57). |
11/21/2048 |
Retired from professional baseball. |