03/26/2033 |
Signed a minor league contract out of Unknown Lands with the Mirkwood Sylvan organization. |
01/01/2034 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 1 (18); Power: 8 (26); Eye: 1 (41). |
01/01/2035 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 3 (17); Power: 10 (18); Eye: 3 (35). |
01/01/2036 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 8 (25); Power: 15 (28); Eye: 9 (48). |
04/07/2036 |
Promoted from international complex to Single A Greenwood. |
01/01/2037 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 8 (19); Power: 15 (28); Eye: 15 (65). |
04/05/2037 |
Injured (Mild hamstring strain), day-to-day for 1 day. |
04/17/2037 |
Injured (Bruised toe), day-to-day for 3 days. |
06/03/2037 |
Injured (Viral infection), day-to-day for 2 days. |
07/24/2037 |
Injured (Bruised knee), day-to-day for 2 days. |
01/01/2038 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 22 (27); Power: 22 (31); Eye: 23 (68). |
05/23/2038 |
Injured (Knee contusion), day-to-day for 6 days. |
06/12/2038 |
Injured (Precautionary reasons (head injury)), out for 1 day. |
06/25/2038 |
Injured (Hamstring tightness), day-to-day for 1 day. |
07/04/2038 |
Injured (Hand contusion), out for 4 days. |
07/24/2038 |
Injured (Finger blister), day-to-day for 3 days. |
01/01/2039 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 23 (27); Power: 22 (29); Eye: 24 (69). |
05/01/2039 |
Injured (Finger blister), day-to-day for 2 weeks. |
09/04/2039 |
Wins the 2039 SGCBL Single A Single A Championships with the Greenwood Greats! |
01/01/2040 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 23 (26); Power: 24 (30); Eye: 27 (69). |
09/06/2040 |
Wins the 2040 SGCBL Double A Double A Championships with the Eryn Lasgalen Old Forests! |
09/06/2040 |
Wins the 2040 SGCBL Single A Single A Championships with the Greenwood Greats! |
01/01/2041 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 23 (26); Power: 26 (30); Eye: 40 (69). |
06/25/2041 |
Injured (Hamstring soreness), day-to-day for 5 days. |
09/06/2041 |
Wins the 2041 SGCBL Single A Single A Championships with the Greenwood Greats! |
01/01/2042 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 27 (28); Power: 28 (29); Eye: 60 (70). |
02/03/2042 |
Was traded by the Mirkwood Sylvan to the Andelain Giants, along with RF Granil Furansson, SP Zibguk Fingereater, in exchange for SP Malin Bramblebush, CF Nagush Gabrat. |
12/12/2042 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2043 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 28 (28); Power: 28 (29); Eye: 66 (70). |
01/27/2043 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Land of Oz Munchkins organization. |
04/15/2043 |
Goes 5-5 against the Archenland Stallions, with 1 2B, 0 RBI and 1 R. |
06/21/2043 |
Was selected to the 2043 SciFi and Fantasy League All-Star Game. |
12/12/2043 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $550,000. |
01/01/2044 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 28 (28); Power: 28 (30); Eye: 67 (72). |
12/11/2044 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $550,000. |
01/01/2045 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 28 (28); Power: 28 (29); Eye: 68 (75). |
05/21/2045 |
Injured (oblique strain),out for 2 weeks. |
12/04/2045 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $550,000. |
01/01/2046 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (26); Power: 27 (29); Eye: 68 (75). |
11/26/2046 |
Released by the Land of Oz Munchkins. |
01/01/2047 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (25); Power: 29 (29); Eye: 68 (68). |
08/23/2047 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Dagorlad Disaster organization. |
09/08/2047 |
Retired from professional baseball. |