06/15/2037 |
Drafted in the 2037 first-year player draft (Round 4, Pick 9, 63rd overall pick) by the Dyson Spheres. |
01/01/2038 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 30 (61); Movement: 18 (23); Control: 11 (42). |
04/19/2038 |
Named the #90 prospect in the SFL |
05/07/2038 |
Injured (Fever), out for 4 days. |
08/01/2038 |
Wins the 2038 SFL Triple A Round 2 with the Rimmerworld Clones! |
01/01/2039 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 39 (61); Movement: 17 (20); Control: 19 (41). |
07/24/2039 |
Was traded by the Dyson Spheres to the Lake Town Archers in exchange for 3B Sing Koboldbasher. |
01/01/2040 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 47 (61); Movement: 20 (20); Control: 21 (41). |
04/01/2040 |
Released by the Lake Town organization. |
04/11/2040 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Mirkwood Sylvan organization. |
04/24/2040 |
Pitches a 4-hit shutout against the Rhosgobel Rainbow with 7 strikeouts and 2 BB allowed! |
05/07/2040 |
Injured (Tender shoulder), day-to-day for one week. |
09/06/2040 |
Wins the 2040 SGCBL Double A Double A Championships with the Eryn Lasgalen Old Forests! |
09/06/2040 |
Wins the 2040 SGCBL Single A Single A Championships with the Greenwood Greats! |
01/01/2041 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 48 (57); Movement: 22 (22); Control: 23 (41). |
01/01/2042 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 56 (59); Movement: 18 (18); Control: 25 (40). |
02/03/2042 |
Was traded by the Mirkwood Sylvan to the Andelain Giants, along with 3B Giancarlo McMullan, RF Granil Furansson, in exchange for SP Malin Bramblebush, CF Nagush Gabrat. |
12/12/2042 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $400,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/2043 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 50 (55); Movement: 16 (16); Control: 27 (40). |
04/10/2043 |
Released by the Andelain organization. |
04/17/2043 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Xanth Centaurs organization. |
07/16/2043 |
Released by the Xanth organization. |
07/21/2043 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Babylon Five Rangers organization. |
12/12/2043 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
12/15/2043 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Chiba City Neuromancers organization. |
01/01/2044 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 51 (55); Movement: 14 (14); Control: 30 (31). |
04/08/2044 |
Released by the Chiba City organization. |
04/11/2044 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Intergalactic Hitchhikers organization. |
07/10/2044 |
Released by the Intergalactic organization. |
07/12/2044 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Tatooine Sandcrawlers organization. |
12/11/2044 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/2045 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 48 (53); Movement: 13 (13); Control: 31 (32). |
01/11/2045 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Intergalactic Hitchhikers organization. |
04/14/2045 |
Released by the Intergalactic organization. |
08/04/2045 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Chiba City Neuromancers organization. |
12/04/2045 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/2046 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 48 (50); Movement: 7 (7); Control: 30 (31). |
01/01/2047 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 46 (46); Movement: 8 (8); Control: 34 (34). |
11/11/2047 |
Retired from professional baseball. |