06/15/2013 |
Drafted in the 2013 first-year player draft (Round 7, Pick 13, 157th overall Pick) by the Ravenhill Darkwings. |
01/01/2014 |
SISA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (52); Power: 19 (44); Eye: 22 (45). |
06/30/2014 |
Goes 5-6 against the North Mordor Flying Dragons, with 1 HR, 4 RBI and 3 R. |
07/07/2014 |
Wins the A BL Player of the Week Award. |
01/01/2015 |
SISA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 42 (72); Power: 26 (44); Eye: 28 (67). |
05/12/2015 |
Injured (bruised ribs), day-to-day for 2 weeks. |
06/21/2015 |
Goes 5-7 against the Lithlad Lambas, with 1 2B, 2 HR, 4 RBI and 4 R. |
01/01/2016 |
SISA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 47 (74); Power: 26 (44); Eye: 28 (75). |
03/25/2016 |
Got claimed off waivers by Erebor while with Ravenhill. |
07/14/2016 |
Goes 5-5 against the Entwash Goblins, with 0 RBI and 3 R. |
07/18/2016 |
Was traded by the Erebor Eagles to the Moria Miners, along with LF V. Fareomer, RF R. Fields, in exchange for C F. Denihil, 3B T. Fandir, SP S. Liverdicer Jr., CF C. Greenthumb. |
01/01/2017 |
SISA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 49 (74); Power: 29 (44); Eye: 32 (75). |
01/01/2018 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 48 (73); Power: 29 (43); Eye: 40 (78). |
01/01/2019 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 48 (71); Power: 31 (40); Eye: 41 (78). |
02/27/2019 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract extension with the Moria Miners organization. |
03/12/2019 |
Injured (concussion), out for 2-3 weeks. |
08/26/2019 |
Released by the Moria organization. |
09/10/2019 |
Signed a 0-year minor league contract with the Old Forest Merry Fellows organization. |
11/25/2019 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/2020 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 47 (66); Power: 33 (35); Eye: 41 (76). |
01/01/2021 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 48 (61); Power: 32 (34); Eye: 44 (75). |
01/01/2021 |
Retired from professional baseball. |